California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 30, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 21, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012