|
09/27/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5018.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6586.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3613.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3301.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|