LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1154
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1154
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1154
Compare Versions
SB1154 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1154 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1154 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1154 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1154 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1154 Amended April 11, 2012
SB1154 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1154 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1154 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1154 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1154 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1154 Amended May 2, 2012
SB1154 Amended April 11, 2012
SB1154 Introduced February 21, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare