|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 653, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6120.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3426.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3207.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3143.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|