LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1170
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1170
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1170
Compare Versions
SB1170 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1170 Enrolled August 24, 2012
SB1170 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1170 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1170 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1170 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1170 Chaptered September 27, 2012
SB1170 Enrolled August 24, 2012
SB1170 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1170 Amended April 12, 2012
SB1170 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1170 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare