|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5022.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 6465.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5604.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3459.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3259.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|