LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1172
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1172
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1172
Compare Versions
SB1172 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB1172 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1172 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1172 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 30, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1172 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1172 Chaptered September 30, 2012
SB1172 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1172 Amended July 5, 2012
SB1172 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 30, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 25, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 16, 2012
SB1172 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1172 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare