|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 383, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2012
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 5131.) Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 3. Page 5119.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 5101.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6786.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6251.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected June 25.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3641.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3459.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|