LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1186
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1186
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1186
Compare Versions
SB1186 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB1186 Enrolled September 6, 2012
SB1186 Amended August 30, 2012
SB1186 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1186 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1186 Amended May 16, 2012
SB1186 Amended April 30, 2012
SB1186 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1186 Chaptered September 19, 2012
SB1186 Enrolled September 6, 2012
SB1186 Amended August 30, 2012
SB1186 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1186 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1186 Amended May 16, 2012
SB1186 Amended April 30, 2012
SB1186 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare