|
09/24/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 515, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 4857.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6176.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 5. Page 3716.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3592.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3207.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|