California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1193 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012