|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 706, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5099.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6765.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Action rescinded whereby the Assembly amendments were concurred in. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4677.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6013.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5899.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 3745.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3306.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|