LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1195
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1195
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1195
Compare Versions
SB1195 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB1195 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1195 Amended August 30, 2012
SB1195 Amended August 13, 2012
SB1195 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1195 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1195 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1195 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1195 Chaptered September 28, 2012
SB1195 Enrolled September 10, 2012
SB1195 Amended August 30, 2012
SB1195 Amended August 13, 2012
SB1195 Amended June 26, 2012
SB1195 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1195 Amended March 26, 2012
SB1195 Introduced February 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare