|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 802, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5114.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6750.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 13. Page 6773.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6468.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6261.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 5340.) Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5340.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|