California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 30, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 20, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012