|
09/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 311, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6183.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3708.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3594.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 3206.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3022.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|