California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1241 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 13, 2012

Amended

Bill June 25, 2012
Bill June 7, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012