|
09/11/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 293, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6067.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3695.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3594.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3458.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
Set for hearing May 9.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|