California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1243 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 11, 2012

Amended

Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 15, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012