|
09/30/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 4873.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 23. Page 6068.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 3660.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3594.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3229.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|