California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1246 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Amended

Bill July 5, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 25, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012