California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1278 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012
Bill May 29, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012