LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1278
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1278
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1278
Compare Versions
SB1278 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB1278 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1278 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1278 Amended June 12, 2012
SB1278 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1278 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1278 Amended April 19, 2012
SB1278 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1278 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1278 Chaptered September 25, 2012
SB1278 Enrolled August 31, 2012
SB1278 Amended August 20, 2012
SB1278 Amended June 12, 2012
SB1278 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1278 Amended May 1, 2012
SB1278 Amended April 19, 2012
SB1278 Amended March 29, 2012
SB1278 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare