|
09/26/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 576, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4845.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6140.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 3706.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3595.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3302.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|