LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1290
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1290
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1290
Compare Versions
SB1290 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB1290 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1290 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1290 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1290 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1290 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1290 Chaptered September 26, 2012
SB1290 Enrolled August 30, 2012
SB1290 Amended June 20, 2012
SB1290 Amended May 29, 2012
SB1290 Amended March 28, 2012
SB1290 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare