|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 836, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4626.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3495.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3208.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 1.)
|
|
|