California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1294 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012
Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill June 13, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012