California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1318 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Amended

Bill August 24, 2012
Bill August 8, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill June 14, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012