LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1318
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1318
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1318
Compare Versions
SB1318 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1318 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1318 Amended August 8, 2012
SB1318 Amended August 7, 2012
SB1318 Amended June 14, 2012
SB1318 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1318 Amended April 11, 2012
SB1318 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1318 Enrolled September 5, 2012
SB1318 Amended August 24, 2012
SB1318 Amended August 8, 2012
SB1318 Amended August 7, 2012
SB1318 Amended June 14, 2012
SB1318 Amended May 25, 2012
SB1318 Amended April 11, 2012
SB1318 Introduced February 23, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare