|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5011.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6201.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5894.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3530.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3143.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|