California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 16, 2012
Bill August 13, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012