|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4628.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5969.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 5. Page 3617.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3310.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3231.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|