California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1349 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill May 2, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012