07/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 69, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/09/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/28/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
06/25/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/25/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5421.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/20/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |||
05/25/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3459.) (May 8). | |||
05/02/2012 | Set for hearing May 8. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |