California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1365 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/10/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1365CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 69 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 10, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 10, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE MAY 14, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY JUNE 25, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 30, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Negrete McLeod FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 1799.106 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to emergency medical services. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1365, Negrete McLeod. Emergency medical services: immunity. Existing law limits the civil liability of a licensed nurse who in good faith renders emergency care at the scene of an emergency which occurs outside both the place and the course of that person's employment, as specified. Existing law also limits the civil liability of firefighters, police officers or other law enforcement officers, and emergency medical technicians who render emergency medical services at the scene of an emergency, as specified. This bill would extend the above-described liability limit applicable to firefighters, police officers or other law enforcement officers, and emergency medical technicians to emergency medical services rendered during an emergency air or ground ambulance transport, and emergency medical services rendered by a registered nurse, as defined, at the scene of an emergency or during an emergency air or ground ambulance transport. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. The Legislature finds and declares both of the following: (a) Since the original enactment of Section 1799.106 of the Health and Safety Code, registered nurses have become more directly involved in the provision of emergency medical services, as crew members in both air and ground ambulances. (b) Registered nurses should be encouraged to provide emergency medical services in air and ground ambulances in the same way as firefighters, law enforcement, and EMT-Is and EMT-Ps. SEC. 2. Section 1799.106 of the Health and Safety Code is amended to read: 1799.106. (a) In addition to the provisions of Section 1799.104 of this code, Section 2727.5 of the Business and Professions Code, and Section 1714.2 of the Civil Code, and in order to encourage the provision of emergency medical services by firefighters, police officers or other law enforcement officers, EMT-I, EMT-II, EMT-P, or registered nurses, a firefighter, police officer or other law enforcement officer, EMT-I, EMT-II, EMT-P, or registered nurse who renders emergency medical services at the scene of an emergency or during an emergency air or ground ambulance transport shall only be liable in civil damages for acts or omissions performed in a grossly negligent manner or acts or omissions not performed in good faith. A public agency employing such a firefighter, police officer or other law enforcement officer, EMT-I, EMT-II, EMT-P, or registered nurse shall not be liable for civil damages if the firefighter, police officer or other law enforcement officer, EMT-I, EMT-II, EMT-P, or registered nurse is not liable. (b) For purposes of this section, "registered nurse" means a registered nurse trained in emergency medical services and licensed pursuant to Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 2700) of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code.