|
09/28/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 4770.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6121.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6002.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 3487.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3105.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|