California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1366 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill April 17, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012