|
06/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5344.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3616.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 24).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|