California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill June 19, 2012

Chaptered

Bill June 28, 2012

Amended

Bill May 16, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012