|
08/28/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Allen.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 3652.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3341.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. (Corrected March 29.)
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|