California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill August 7, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012