|
09/22/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 457, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5095.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6671.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6674.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Page 6578.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4679.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6011.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5898.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5421.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19).
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3129.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3036.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|