California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1381 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill August 29, 2012
Bill August 13, 2012
Bill May 14, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012