|
08/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 4468.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 5. Page 5849.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 26).
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
Referred to Com. on W., P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 3529.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3446.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|