California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1386 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 14, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 28, 2012

Amended

Bill July 3, 2012
Bill April 12, 2012