|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 656, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5097.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 6725.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6020.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3487.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3087.) (April 9).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/21/2012
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|