California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 20, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012
Bill April 11, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012