|
07/09/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5344.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3130.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|