California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1388 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill June 26, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 10, 2012

Amended

Bill June 13, 2012
Bill May 31, 2012
Bill April 10, 2012