|
03/01/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2228.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2695.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 25. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
Referred to Com. on BUDGET.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1136.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 971.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 494.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Set for hearing March 30.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Set for hearing February 23.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
12/07/2010
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
|
|
|
|
12/06/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|